+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2013.
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0).
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: Senate Vote on HCR 141, ADOPT (#988)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
June 4, 2013: House Vote on HCR 141, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#864)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor