+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/6/2016.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 5, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
- Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-0).
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2016: Senate Vote on HCR 135, ADOPT (#1317)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
June 3, 2016: House Vote on HCR 135, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1261)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor