+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 72, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Vote
May 11, 2018: House Vote on HR 133, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#971)
- Yeas: 72
- Absent: 33
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor