+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/01/2015.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2015: Senate Vote on HCR 126, ADOPT (#792)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
June 1, 2015: House Vote on HCR 126, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#625)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor