+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17.
- Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2017: House Vote on HCR 110, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#647)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 14
June 2, 2017: Senate Vote on HCR 110, ADOPT (#697)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor