+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2021.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0-1).
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Vote
May 26, 2021: House Vote on HR 108, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#712)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor