+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
- Rules suspended.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On February 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On February 19, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 81, nays 14. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 02/19/17.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (21-2).
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
+ − Amendments (11)
+ − Votes (8)
February 22, 2017: Senate Vote on HCR 1, FINAL PASSAGE (#60)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 2
February 22, 2017: House Vote on HCR 1, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#44)
- Yeas: 97
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
February 19, 2017: House Vote on HCR 1, AMENDMENT # 162 BY THIBAUT, MOTION TO ADOPT (#23)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 59
- Absent: 9
February 19, 2017: House Vote on HCR 1, AMENDMENT # 164 BY LANDRY, T., MOTION TO ADOPT (#24)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 54
- Absent: 9
February 19, 2017: House Vote on HCR 1, AMENDMENT # 158 BY REYNOLDS, MOTION TO ADOPT (#21)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 7
February 19, 2017: House Vote on HCR 1, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#26)
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 7
February 19, 2017: House Vote on HCR 1, AMENDMENT # 169 BY CARTER, G., MOTION TO ADOPT (#25)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 58
- Absent: 6
February 19, 2017: House Vote on HCR 1, AMENDMENT # 163 BY SMITH, MOTION TO ADOPT (#22)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 55
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor