+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/18.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 5, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
On February 25, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Vote
April 16, 2018: House Vote on HR 1, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#452)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor