+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/17.
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported favorably (13-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
- Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Vote
June 2, 2017: House Vote on HR 1, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#651)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor