+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
- Rules suspended.
- Reported with amendments (16-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor