+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 140.
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/03/19.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/19.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (10-0).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/22/2019.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2019: House Vote on HB 94, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#874)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
June 2, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 94, FINAL PASSAGE (#780)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 15, 2019: House Vote on HB 94, FINAL PASSAGE (#337)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor