+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 261.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0).
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 17, 2016: House Vote on HB 924, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#817)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 14
May 5, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 924, FINAL PASSAGE (#617)
- Yeas: 29
- Absent: 10
April 20, 2016: House Vote on HB 924, FINAL PASSAGE (#395)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor