+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 427.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2014.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 88, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2014.
- Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (6-0).
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (7-3-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2014: House Vote on HB 909, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1156)
- Yeas: 83
- Absent: 21
May 20, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 909, FINAL PASSAGE (#1194)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
May 7, 2014: House Vote on HB 909, FINAL PASSAGE (#764)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor