+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 19, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 53, nays 42. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/18.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0).
On March 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2018.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Vote
March 19, 2018: House Vote on HB 90, FINAL PASSAGE (#31)
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 42
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor