+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/19.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0-1).
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/15/2019.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2019: Senate Vote on HB 9, FINAL PASSAGE (#333)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 30, 2019: House Vote on HB 9, FINAL PASSAGE (#96)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor