+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 07/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 151.
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2016.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 5, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 899, FINAL PASSAGE (#615)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
April 7, 2016: House Vote on HB 899, FINAL PASSAGE (#235)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor