+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 346.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/31/2014.
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (3)
May 12, 2014: House Vote on HB 891, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#833)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 7
April 30, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 891, FINAL PASSAGE (#616)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
March 31, 2014: House Vote on HB 891, FINAL PASSAGE (#168)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor