+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 1.
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 15, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 4/17/2013.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular).
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/8/2013.
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 14, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 89, FINAL PASSAGE (#376)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
April 17, 2013: House Vote on HB 89, FINAL PASSAGE (#49)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor