+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2020.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 10.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On May 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On March 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On February 24, 2020 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/24/2020.
On February 17, 2020 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 89, FINAL PASSAGE (#295)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
May 15, 2020: House Vote on HB 89, FINAL PASSAGE (#60)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor