+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 425.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2014.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 876, FINAL PASSAGE (#1337)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 28, 2014: House Vote on HB 876, FINAL PASSAGE (#626)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 16
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor