+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 705.
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Rules suspended.
- Conference Committee report received.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Cortez, Hewitt, and Bishop.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Horton, Terry Landry, and Seabaugh.
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/17/18.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (16-0).
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 18, 2018: House Vote on HB 854, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1404)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 11
May 18, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 854, ADOPT (#1397)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
May 17, 2018: House Vote on HB 854, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1324)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 12
May 16, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 854, FINAL PASSAGE (#1200)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
April 17, 2018: House Vote on HB 854, FINAL PASSAGE (#476)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor