+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/17/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 594.
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/8/2016.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Cortez, and Johns.
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Robert Johnson, Havard, and Hall.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 853, ADOPT (#1355)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
June 6, 2016: House Vote on HB 853, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1345)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
June 3, 2016: House Vote on HB 853, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1239)
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 4
May 31, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 853, FINAL PASSAGE (#1173)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
April 20, 2016: House Vote on HB 853, FINAL PASSAGE (#392)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor