+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 05/31/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 282.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016.
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2016.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/23/2016.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/12/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 18, 2016: House Vote on HB 85, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#864)
- Yeas: 83
- Absent: 21
May 12, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 85, FINAL PASSAGE (#751)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
March 24, 2016: House Vote on HB 85, FINAL PASSAGE (#34)
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor