+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 364.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/26/2015.
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 599 reported by the Committee on Education (14-0).
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 844, FINAL PASSAGE (#891)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 26, 2015: House Vote on HB 844, FINAL PASSAGE (#490)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor