+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/18.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (6-0).
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor