+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 15, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0).
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On March 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2020: House Vote on HB 830, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#664)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 6
May 26, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 830, FINAL PASSAGE (#376)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 15, 2020: House Vote on HB 830, FINAL PASSAGE (#94)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor