+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 702.
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/16/18.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/18.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0).
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
May 16, 2018: House Vote on HB 821, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1211)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
May 9, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 821, FINAL PASSAGE (#952)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
April 18, 2018: House Vote on HB 821, FINAL PASSAGE (#502)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor