+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 666.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016.
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2016: House Vote on HB 819, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1184)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
May 25, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 819, FINAL PASSAGE (#1033)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
April 27, 2016: House Vote on HB 819, FINAL PASSAGE (#516)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor