+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 593.
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 5, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016.
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
- Called from the calendar.
- House conferees appointed: Stokes, Hoffmann, and Ivey.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Barrow, Mills, and Peterson.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (9-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
June 6, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 815, ADOPT (#1349)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
June 6, 2016: House Vote on HB 815, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1340)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
June 3, 2016: House Vote on HB 815, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1265)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
May 30, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 815, FINAL PASSAGE (#1136)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
April 27, 2016: House Vote on HB 815, FINAL PASSAGE (#515)
- Yeas: 87
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor