+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2013.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 401.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Called from the calendar.
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 2. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013.
On June 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee report received.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Kostelka, and Murray.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On May 28, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Thompson, Lopinto, and Terry Landry.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On May 23, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 5/28/2013.
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 2 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 18. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 4/23/2013.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-5) (Regular).
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/8/2013.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Votes (6)
June 6, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 8, ADOPT (#1020)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
June 5, 2013: House Vote on HB 8, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#917)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 12
May 28, 2013: House Vote on HB 8, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#595)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 17
May 21, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 8, AMENDMENT # 2136 BY CLAITOR, HB 8 BY THOMPSON (#489)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 4
May 21, 2013: Senate Vote on HB 8, FINAL PASSAGE (#490)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 4
April 23, 2013: House Vote on HB 8, FINAL PASSAGE (#95)
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (43)
Type:
Primary Sponsor