+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: 06/01/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 2.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 18, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/29/2021.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (18-0).
On April 12, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/12/2021.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 8, FINAL PASSAGE (#387)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 4
April 29, 2021: House Vote on HB 8, FINAL PASSAGE (#128)
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 10