+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 637.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2014.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 28, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title.
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 27, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 789, FINAL PASSAGE (#1399)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 5, 2014: House Vote on HB 789, FINAL PASSAGE (#725)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor