+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2020 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/20.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 93.
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On May 4, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 31, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2020: Senate Vote on HB 780, FINAL PASSAGE (#540)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
May 22, 2020: House Vote on HB 780, FINAL PASSAGE (#353)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor