+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 410.
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/13/2016.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/12/2016.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 30, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 78, FINAL PASSAGE (#1142)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
April 13, 2016: House Vote on HB 78, FINAL PASSAGE (#294)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor