+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: June 19, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 131.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 9, Senate amendments concurred in.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 5 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2015.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-5).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title.
+ − Amendments (15)
+ − Votes (11)
June 9, 2015: House Vote on HB 779, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1007)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 5
June 8, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 779, AMENDMENT # 3692 BY MARTINY, HB 779 BY PONTI (#950)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 22
June 8, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 779, AMENDMENT # 3696 BY MORRELL, HB 779 BY PONTI (#951)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 20
June 8, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 779, FINAL PASSAGE (#952)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 5
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 779, AMENDMENT # 2702 BY BROADWATER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#253)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 8
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 779, AMENDMENT # 2655 BY BROADWATER, MOTION TO ADOPT (#249)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 7
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 779, FINAL PASSAGE (#254)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 13
- Absent: 2
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 779, FINAL PASSAGE (#254)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 12
- Absent: 3
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 779, AMENDMENT # 2685 BY HARRIS, MOTION TO ADOPT (#250)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 62
- Absent: 12
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 779, AMENDMENT # 2652 BY JAMES, MOTION TO ADOPT (#251)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 56
- Absent: 8
May 7, 2015: House Vote on HB 779, AMENDMENT # 2698 BY ORTEGO, MOTION TO ADOPT (#252)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 79
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor