+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 360.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to its regular order on the calendar.
- Notice given to reconsider the vote by which the bill passed.
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/12/2015.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 5, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 772, FINAL PASSAGE (#812)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
June 4, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 772, FINAL PASSAGE (#785)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 12, 2015: House Vote on HB 772, FINAL PASSAGE (#310)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor