+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 23, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 464.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/15/18.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/18.
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-2).
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2018: House Vote on HB 769, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1128)
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 15
May 8, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 769, FINAL PASSAGE (#849)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
April 23, 2018: House Vote on HB 769, FINAL PASSAGE (#529)
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 22
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor