+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 17, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 591.
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
On June 5, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 5, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Barrow, Mills, and Perry.
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Carpenter, Hoffmann, and Smith.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 1, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 17, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 03/22/2016.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (6)
June 6, 2016: House Vote on HB 763, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1339)
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
June 6, 2016: House Vote on HB 763, MOTION TO ADOPT (#1339)
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 5
June 5, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 763, ADOPT (#1328)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2016: House Vote on HB 763, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1229)
- Yeas: 96
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 8
May 30, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 763, FINAL PASSAGE (#1110)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
March 22, 2016: House Vote on HB 763, FINAL PASSAGE (#23)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 12