+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 232.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2016.
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 31, 2016 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/12/2016.
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2016: Senate Vote on HB 76, FINAL PASSAGE (#832)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
April 11, 2016: House Vote on HB 76, FINAL PASSAGE (#245)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor