+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 317.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 05/13/2014.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/03/2014.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (4)
May 13, 2014: House Vote on HB 750, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#866)
- Yeas: 83
- Absent: 21
May 6, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 750, CO-AUTHORS (#715)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 15
May 6, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 750, FINAL PASSAGE (#716)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
April 3, 2014: House Vote on HB 750, FINAL PASSAGE (#248)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (88)
Type:
Primary Sponsor