+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 19, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 129.
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 82, nays 9. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Called from the calendar.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Morrell, Donahue, and Adley.
- Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Stokes, Robideaux, and Leger.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for concurrence on 6/09/2015.
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/28/2015.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
June 11, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 748, ADOPT (#1111)
- Yeas: 39
June 11, 2015: House Vote on HB 748, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1117)
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 14
June 9, 2015: House Vote on HB 748, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#982)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 13
June 6, 2015: Senate Vote on HB 748, FINAL PASSAGE (#910)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
May 28, 2015: House Vote on HB 748, FINAL PASSAGE (#567)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor