+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 182.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/18.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/18.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0).
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On March 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Votes (2)
May 8, 2018: Senate Vote on HB 739, FINAL PASSAGE (#864)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
April 23, 2018: House Vote on HB 739, FINAL PASSAGE (#543)
- Yeas: 81
- Absent: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor