+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 5, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 525.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2014.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2014.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2014.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (15-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2014: House Vote on HB 733, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1538)
- Yeas: 86
- Absent: 18
May 28, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 733, FINAL PASSAGE (#1452)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
May 12, 2014: House Vote on HB 733, FINAL PASSAGE (#848)
- Yeas: 85
- Absent: 19
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor