+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Notice removed
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2015.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 5/05/2015.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor