+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0).
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Vote
May 17, 2016: House Vote on HB 717, FINAL PASSAGE (#840)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor