+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/18.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (6-0).
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
+ − Vote
April 10, 2018: House Vote on HB 713, FINAL PASSAGE (#347)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor