+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 19, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: August 1, 2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 794.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/08/2014.
On April 1, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On March 31, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2014: House Vote on HB 709, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1361)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
May 26, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 709, FINAL PASSAGE (#1370)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
April 8, 2014: House Vote on HB 709, FINAL PASSAGE (#309)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor