+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 380.
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
- Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2021.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2021.
On May 11, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 343 reported by the Committee on Judiciary (9-0).
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 7, 2021: House Vote on HB 706, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1025)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
June 3, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 706, FINAL PASSAGE (#762)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 1
May 17, 2021: House Vote on HB 706, FINAL PASSAGE (#479)
- Yeas: 93
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor