+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 4, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 80.
- Effective date: See Act.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Received from the Senate without amendments.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 4 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Called from the calendar.
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 24. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Notice given.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
On May 3, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2021.
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 628 reported by the Committee on Ways and Means (16-0).
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2021: Senate Vote on HB 697, FINAL PASSAGE (#424)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 2
May 10, 2021: House Vote on HB 697, FINAL PASSAGE (#335)
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 24
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor