+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Effective date: 08/01/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 337.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, roll called, yeas 89, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Received from the Senate with amendments.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/10/2014.
- Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0).
On March 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Prefiled.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (3)
May 20, 2014: House Vote on HB 683, CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1050)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 15
May 13, 2014: Senate Vote on HB 683, FINAL PASSAGE (#873)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
April 10, 2014: House Vote on HB 683, FINAL PASSAGE (#382)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor